SC H4554 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-23 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haley
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-23 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haley
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY REPEALING CHAPTER 29, TITLE 23 RELATING TO THE SUBVERSIVE ACTIVITIES REGISTRATION ACT.
Title
By Repealing Chapter 29, Title 23 Relating To The Subversive Activities Registration Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haley | |
2010-02-17 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Duncan | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-7 | |
2010-02-16 | Introduced and read first time HJ-7 |
Same As/Similar To
S1167 (Similar To) 2010-06-17 - Act No. 215
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4554&session=118 |