SC H4548 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 9-1-1790, Relating To The Earnings Limitation For A Retired Member Of The South Carolina Retirement System Upon The Return To Covered Employment, So As To Provide That This Limitation Does Not Apply To Members Who Return To Covered Employment As A School Bus Driver.
Title
Earnings limitation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 89 N: 14 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 89 N: 14 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-28 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0 |
2024-03-27 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-27 | House | Amended |
2024-03-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hart, Henderson-Myers |
2024-03-21 | House | Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-03-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Wooten, Forrest, S.Jones, Long, Herbkersman, Cobb-Hunter, Haddon, Bailey, Whitmire |
2024-01-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: West |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-11-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-11-16 | House | Prefiled |