SC H4542 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Veto overridden by originating body Yeas-102 Nays-2 HJ-123
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Veto overridden by originating body Yeas-102 Nays-2 HJ-123
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND SECTION 8-13-320, AS AMENDED, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO DUTIES AND POWERS OF THE STATE ETHICS COMMISSION, SO AS TO DELETE THE PROHIBITION OF THE RELEASE OF INFORMATION UNTIL FINAL DISPOSITION OF AN ETHICS INVESTIGATION AND REQUIRE THAT THE INFORMATION MAY NOT BE RELEASED UNTIL A FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE HAS BEEN MADE; AND TO AMEND SECTION 8-13-1372, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO THE AUTHORITY OF STATE ETHICS COMMISSION TO DETERMINE THAT ERRORS OR OMISSIONS ON CAMPAIGN REPORTS ARE INADVERTENT AND MAY BE HANDLED AS TECHNICAL VIOLATIONS, SO AS TO CHANGE REFERENCES OF THE STATE ETHICS COMMISSION TO THE APPROPRIATE SUPERVISORY OFFICE. - ratified title
Title
Change References Of The State Ethics Commission To The Appropriate Supervisory Office. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | Veto overridden by originating body Yeas-102 Nays-2 HJ-123 | |
2010-06-11 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2010-06-07 | Ratified R 329 | |
2010-06-01 | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 HJ-83 | |
2010-06-01 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled HJ-83 | |
2010-05-26 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments SJ-52 | |
2010-05-26 | Amended SJ-52 | |
2010-05-13 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-05-12 | Read second time SJ-25 | |
2010-05-12 | Amended SJ-25 | |
2010-05-06 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary SJ-3 | |
2010-04-21 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-8 | |
2010-04-21 | Introduced and read first time SJ-8 | |
2010-04-21 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-11 | |
2010-04-20 | Read second time HJ-165 | |
2010-04-20 | Amended HJ-165 | |
2010-04-20 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McLeod | |
2010-04-15 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks | |
2010-04-14 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary HJ-76 | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-2 | |
2010-02-16 | Introduced and read first time HJ-2 |
Same As/Similar To
S1243 (Similar To) 2010-05-06 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-16
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4542&session=118 |