SC H4519 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 162
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 162
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 40-13-40 So As To Provide Persons Registered With The State Board Of Barber Examiners As Barbers Or Master Hair Care Specialists May Practice Within The Scope Of Their License In Salons Registered With The State Board Of Cosmetology. - Ratified Title
Title
Barbers
Sponsors
Rep. Chip Huggins [R] | Rep. Victor Dabney [R] | Rep. Cally Forrest [R] | Rep. Joseph Bustos [R] |
Rep. Christopher Wooten [R] | Rep. Sandy McGarry [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Act No. 162 | |
2022-05-31 | Effective date 05/13/22 | |
2022-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-12 | Ratified R 214 | |
2022-05-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-0 |
2022-05-11 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Amended |
2022-04-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Polled out of committee Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-04-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-0 |
2022-04-06 | House | Read second time |
2022-04-06 | House | Amended |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-11-10 | House | Prefiled |