SC H4510 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-21 - Referred to Committee on Education SJ-7
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-21 - Referred to Committee on Education SJ-7
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 59-121-20, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO MEMBERS OF THE BOARD OF VISITORS OF THE CITADEL, SO AS TO REVISE THE MANNER IN WHICH THE MEMBERS OF THE BOARD ELECTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY ARE SELECTED, AND FURTHER PROVIDE FOR THEIR TERMS OF OFFICE AND OTHER APPLICABLE PROVISIONS PERTAINING TO THEIR SERVICE ON THE BOARD.
Title
Revise The Manner In Which The Members Of The Board Elected By The General Assembly Are Selected, And Further Provide For Their Terms Of Office And Other Applicable Provisions Pertaining To Their Service On The Board.
Sponsors
Rep. James Battle [D] | Rep. Richard Chalk [R] | Rep. Kristopher Crawford [R] | Rep. Gregory Delleney [R] |
Rep. James Harrison [R] | Rep. Lewis Pinson [R] | Rep. Ted Vick [D] | Rep. Thad Viers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Referred to Committee on Education SJ-7 | |
2010-04-21 | Introduced and read first time SJ-7 | |
2010-04-21 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-8 | |
2010-04-20 | Read second time HJ-31 | |
2010-04-20 | Amended HJ-29 | |
2010-03-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-03-25 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works HJ-13 | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-88 | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced and read first time HJ-88 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4510&session=118 |