SC H4504 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-36-2110, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Maximum Sales Tax, So As To Provide That A Watercraft Trailer And A Watercraft Motor May Not Be Taxed More Than The Maximum Tax.
Title
Maximum Sales Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2022-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Amended |
2022-02-08 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 2-9-22 |
2022-02-03 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 2-8-22 |
2022-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis |
2022-02-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-3-22 |
2022-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ligon |
2022-01-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kirby |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2021-11-10 | House | Prefiled |