SC H4492 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Change Dosage Limitations For Certain Prescribed Controlled Substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescriptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-02-23HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2018-02-22HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2018-02-22HouseRoll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
2018-02-22HouseRead second time
2018-02-22HouseAmended
2018-02-15HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced and read first time
2017-12-13HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2017-12-13HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4453360(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback