SC H4447 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Interchange Located At Exit 22 Along Interstate Highway 20 In Aiken County "deputy Sheriff Jason L. Sheppard Interchange" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Interchange That Contain The Words "deputy Sheriff Jason L. Sheppard Interchange".
Title
Deputy Sheriff Jason L. Sheppard Interchange
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Taylor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-01-21 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2014-01-16 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2014-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced |