SC H4410 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Require The Department Of Social Services To Manage The Federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (snap) And To Apply For Waivers Of Federal Requirements Applicable To The Snap Program That Promote Nutritious Diets, Including Waivers To Restrict Allowable Food Choices.
Title
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-12-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-12-03 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4066 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
H4409 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
H4411 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
H4412 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4511 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
H4409 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
H4411 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
H4412 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4511 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4410&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4410_20151203.htm |