SC H4405 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Act No. 194
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Act No. 194
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING SECTION 40-43-70 SO AS TO DEFINE CERTAIN TERMS, AND TO PROVIDE FOR THE DISPENSING OF CERTAIN DRUGS OR DEVICES AT A FEDERALLY QUALIFIED HEALTH CENTER. - ratified title
Title
Define Certain Terms, And To Provide For The Dispensing Of Certain Drugs Or Devices At A Federally Qualified Health Center. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Alexander [D] | Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D] | Rep. Kristopher Crawford [R] | Rep. Tracy Edge [R] |
Rep. Anton Gunn [D] | Rep. Cathy Harvin [D] | Rep. Anne Hutto [D] | Rep. Lewis Pinson [R] |
Rep. David Weeks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Act No. 194 | |
2010-06-03 | Effective date 05/28/10 | |
2010-05-28 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Ratified R 243 | |
2010-05-20 | Roll call Yeas-88 Nays-0 HJ-54 | |
2010-05-20 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled HJ-54 | |
2010-05-13 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments SJ-20 | |
2010-05-12 | Read second time SJ-30 | |
2010-05-12 | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted SJ-30 | |
2010-05-11 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs SJ-7 | |
2010-04-21 | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs SJ-6 | |
2010-04-21 | Introduced and read first time SJ-6 | |
2010-04-21 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-11 | |
2010-04-20 | Read second time HJ-102 | |
2010-04-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-04-15 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks | |
2010-04-14 | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs HJ-11 | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs HJ-20 | |
2010-01-21 | Introduced and read first time HJ-20 |
Same As/Similar To
S1088 (Similar To) 2010-05-04 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs HJ-30
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4405&session=118 |