SC H4302 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Act No. 179
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Act No. 179
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND SECTION 22-2-190, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO THE COUNTY JURY AREA DESIGNATIONS FOR USE IN MAGISTRATES COURTS, SO AS TO REVISE THE JURY AREAS FOR KERSHAW COUNTY TO PROVIDE FOR ONE JURY AREA COUNTYWIDE. - ratified title
Title
Revise The Jury Areas For Kershaw County To Provide For One Jury Area Countywide. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Act No. 179 | |
2010-05-26 | Effective date 05/19/10 | |
2010-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-05-13 | Ratified R 213 | |
2010-05-06 | Read third time and enrolled SJ-13 | |
2010-05-05 | Read second time SJ-20 | |
2010-03-17 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary SJ-14 | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Subcommittee: S.Martin (ch), Nicholson, Shoopman | |
2010-02-03 | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary SJ-41 | |
2010-02-02 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary SJ-3 | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Subcommittee: S.Martin (ch), Nicholson, Shoopman | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-12 | |
2010-01-21 | Introduced and read first time SJ-12 | |
2010-01-20 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-13 | |
2010-01-19 | Read second time HJ-15 | |
2010-01-14 | Delegation report: Favorable Kershaw Delegation HJ-522 | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to Kershaw Delegation HJ-16 | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced and read first time HJ-16 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4302&session=118 |