SC H4287 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date 05/22/19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That The Department Of Administration Shall Establish A Process To Conduct A Competitive Bidding Process For The Sale Of Some Or All Of The South Carolina Public Service Authority And To Receive Management Proposals That Do Not Involve A Sale Of Santee Cooper, But Are Designed To Improve The Efficiency And Cost-effectiveness Of Santee Cooper's Electric Operations, And To Provide That Santee Cooper Also Must Submit A Proposal To The Department For Reform, Restructuring, And Changes In Its Operation As An Alternative To A Sale Or Management Proposal; To Provide That The Department Shall Conduct A Thorough Evaluation Of All Bids For The Sale Of Santee Cooper Received Through The Competitive Bidding Process, To Provide That The Department Shall Conduct A Thorough Evaluation Of All Management Proposals For Santee Cooper, And To Provide That The Department Shall Conduct An Analysis Of Santee Cooper's Reform Proposal To Determine If It Is A Feasible Alternative, And To Provide The Criteria For These Evaluations; To Provide For The Various Requirements, Conditions, And Procedures Which Must Be Complied With In Regard To This Joint Resolution, Including Provisions That Require The Department To Establish A Process In Which Its Professional Services Experts Conduct Confidential Negotiations Between The Central Electric Power Cooperative And Each Entity That Submitted A Qualified Bid Or Proposal, Including Santee Cooper, After All The Bids And Proposals Have Been Submitted; To Provide That In The Event Of The Successful Sale Of Santee Cooper And The Purchasing Entity's Contract Contains Projections Of Future Rates, The General Assembly's Approval Of Such Sale On Such Terms Does Not Indicate Its Intent To Bind The Public Service Commission Or Office Of Regulatory Staff To The Projected Rate Figures, And To Provide That The Successful Bidder Shall Be Subject To The Same Statutory And Regulatory Authority Of The Public Service Commission And Office Of Regulatory Staff, As Are All Other Investor-owned Electrical Utilities; To Provide That Following The Negotiations Between Central And Each Entity Which Submitted A Bid Or Proposal, The Professional Services Experts Shall Review The Projected Financial Impact On Santee Cooper's Retail Customers To Ensure That Any Increases Or Decreases To Current Rates For The Retail And Wholesale Customers Are Initially Proportionate; To Provide That Information Received During This Process And Ensuing Negotiations Must Be Kept Confidential With Certain Limited Exceptions, To Require Nondisclosure Agreements, And To Provide That Members Of The General Assembly, The Governor, And Their Respective Staffs Must Not Be Provided With Or Have Access To The Information Obtained During This Process, With Certain Exceptions; To Provide That At The Conclusion Of The Evaluation Of The Bids, Proposals, And Negotiations, But No Later Than January 15, 2020, With A One-time Extension Permitted, The Department Concurrently Shall Present A Recommendation Of One Preferred Bid For Sale And One Preferred Management Proposal That The Professional Services Experts Consider To Be In The Best Interests Of The State, Its Taxpayers, And The Customers Of Santee Cooper, As Well As A Recommendation Concerning Santee Cooper's Proposal For Reform; To Provide That Each Recommendation Must Include Certain Materials And Justifications, And The Recommendation In Regard To The Sale And Management Proposal Must Include A Contract For Each Recommended Bidder Obligating The Bidder To Comply With The Terms Of Its Bid In The Event It Is Approved By The General Assembly, Along With A Proposed Contract To Execute The Sale Or Management Proposal And Any Supporting Documents; And To Provide For The Manner In Which The Department Shall Present To The General Assembly Its Preferred Sale And Management Proposal, As Well As A Recommendation As To Santee Cooper's Reform Proposal, And The Manner In Which The General Assembly Shall Consider And May Approve A Proposal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Service Authority (Santee Cooper)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - House: Adopt Free Conference Report (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Free Conference Report (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate: To Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 96 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 101 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective date 05/22/19
2019-05-22 Signed By Governor
2019-05-22 Ratified R 113
2019-05-21SenateOrdered enrolled for ratification
2019-05-21SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-2
2019-05-21SenateFree conference report adopted
2019-05-21SenateFree conference committee appointed Setzler, Rankin, Massey
2019-05-21SenateRoll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
2019-05-21SenateFree conference powers granted
2019-05-21HouseRoll call Yeas-103 Nays-3
2019-05-21HouseFree conference report adopted
2019-05-21HouseFree conference committee appointed Ott, G.M. Smith, Lucas
2019-05-21HouseRoll call Yeas-113 Nays-0
2019-05-21HouseFree conference powers granted
2019-05-09SenateConference committee appointed Setzler, Rankin, Massey
2019-05-09HouseHouse insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Ott, G.M. Smith, Lucas
2019-05-09SenateNon-concurrence in House amendment
2019-05-08HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-08HouseSenate amendment amended
2019-05-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-03SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-02SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2019-05-02SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-1
2019-05-02SenateRead second time
2019-05-02SenateAmended
2019-04-18SenateRecalled from Committee on Finance
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-04-04SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-04HouseRoll call Yeas-96 Nays-6
2019-04-04HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-03HouseRoll call Yeas-101 Nays-6
2019-04-03HouseRead second time
2019-04-03HouseAmended
2019-04-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, Caskey
2019-04-02HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
2019-03-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Stavrinakis
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4287&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4287_20190321.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4287_20190327.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4287_20190403.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4287_20190418.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4287_20190502.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4287_20190503.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4287_20190508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4287_20190521.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16258
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16265
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16626
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16891
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16894
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16895
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16898

Bill Comments

feedback