SC H4280 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-13 - Referred to Committee on Transportation SJ-11
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-13 - Referred to Committee on Transportation SJ-11
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING ARTICLE 108 TO CHAPTER 3, TITLE 56 SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT THE DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES MAY ISSUE SOUTH CAROLINA HIGHWAY PATROL-RETIRED LICENSE PLATES.
Title
Provide That The Department Of Motor Vehicles May Issue South Carolina Highway Patrol-retired License Plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-13 | Referred to Committee on Transportation SJ-11 | |
2010-05-13 | Introduced and read first time SJ-11 | |
2010-05-13 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-9 | |
2010-05-12 | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 HJ-94 | |
2010-05-12 | Read second time HJ-94 | |
2010-05-06 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hart | |
2010-04-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-04-29 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works HJ-10 | |
2010-02-02 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cato | |
2010-01-28 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Williams, Kennedy, Lowe, Stavrinakis, Knight, Crawford, Daning, Bowen, Thompson, G.A.Brown, King, Lucas, Herbkersman, Wylie, Stewart, Branham, Ott, Hayes, Battle, Miller, Harvin, H.B.Brown, Hosey, Chalk, McEachern, Hodges, Gunn, J.H.Neal, Cobb-Hunter, Jefferson | |
2010-01-27 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.R.Smith, Millwood, Anthony, Simrill, Nanney, Hardwick, Govan, Bingham, Littlejohn, Bannister, Harrell, Hearn, G.R.Smith, Clemmons, Anderson, Limehouse, D.C.Moss, V.S.Moss, Parker, Howard, Gambrell, Allison, Horne, Sottile, Bedingfield, Long, Spires, Hamilton, T.R.Young, Delleney, J.M.Neal | |
2010-01-26 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Duncan, Jennings, Rice, Hiott, Agnew, J.E.Smith | |
2010-01-20 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins | |
2010-01-19 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Parks, Vick, Pinson | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-57 | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced and read first time HJ-57 | |
2009-12-15 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works | |
2009-12-15 | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4280&session=118 |