SC H4182 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Erect A Sign Containing The Words "in Memory Of Sam Jerome Mccall, Jr." Along South Carolina Highway 72 In Laurens County Between Its Intersections With Long View Road And Crystal Bay Drive.
Title
In memory of Sam J. McCall Jr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-05-06 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-05-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced |