SC H4138 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Act No. 193
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Act No. 193
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Each Person Holding A License In The Mechanical Contractor Subclassification Of Air Conditioning, Heating, Or Packaged Equipment Shall Display The Mechanical Contractor License In A Conspicuous Manner At His Principal Place Of Business, To Provide That All Commercial Vehicles Used By Mechanical Contractors Licensed In The Subclassification Of Air Conditioning, Heating, Or Packaged Equipment Exclusively In The Daily Operation Of Their Business Shall Have Prominently Displayed On Them The Mechanical Contractor License Number, And To Provide That Each Invoice And Proposal Form Also Shall Contain The Mechanical Contractor License Number
Title
Mechanical contractor license
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | Act No. 193 | |
2016-06-01 | Effective date 05/26/16 | |
2016-05-26 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-05-24 | Ratified R 202 | |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-3 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-03-17 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-03-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2016-03-16 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-16 | House | Amended |
2016-03-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-05-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S1040 (Similar To) 2016-01-28 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry