SC H4135 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Act No. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Act No. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revise The Manner In Which Members Of The Commission Are Selected, To Revise The Terms Of Office Of Certain Members Of The Commission And The Seats Which Certain Members Of The Commission Are Deemed To Be Filling, And To Revise Or Provide For Other Provisions Relating To The Selection Of Commission Members
Title
Greenville Technical College Area Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Act No. 49 | |
2015-06-08 | Effective date 06/03/15 | |
2015-06-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-05-28 | Ratified R 77 | |
2015-05-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-84 Nays-0 |
2015-05-27 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-05-08 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-05-07 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2015-05-07 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-0 |
2015-05-07 | House | Read second time |
2015-05-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |