SC H4101 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Act No. 95
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Act No. 95
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriate Monies From The Capital Reserve Fund For Fiscal Year 2020-2021, And To Allow Unexpended Funds Appropriated To Be Carried Forward To Succeeding Fiscal Years And Expended For The Same Purposes. - Ratified Title
Title
Capital Reserve Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Act No. 95 | |
2021-07-12 | Effective date 07/25/21 | |
2021-06-25 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-06-21 | Ratified R 117 | |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-46 Nays-0 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-24 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-03-23 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-1 |
2021-03-23 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-18 | House | Special order, set for immediately after third reading of H. 4100 |
2021-03-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |