SC H4048 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 161
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 161
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 1-11-445 So As To Provide That The State Of South Carolina Must Provide A Legal Defense For And Indemnification To A State Agency, Department, Or Instrumentality Against A Claim Or Suit That Arises Out Of Or By Virtue Of The Performance Of Official Duties On Behalf Of A State Agency, Department, Or Instrumentality, And To Provide A Similar Defense And Indemnification To Board Members And Employees, And Officers Of The Entity; To Repeal Section 1-11-440 Relating To Legal Defenses And Indemnifications Provided To Members Of The Fiscal Accountability Authority And Its Director; And To Repeal Section 12-4-325 Relating To Legal Defenses And Indemnification Provided To Officers And Employees Of The Department Of Revenue. - Ratified Title
Title
Duty to defend and indemnify
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Act No. 161 | |
2022-05-31 | Effective date 05/13/22 | |
2022-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-12 | Ratified R 210 | |
2022-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2022-05-12 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-05-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Matthews, Climer, Senn, Cash, Harpootlian |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-04-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-2 |
2022-04-06 | House | Read second time |
2022-04-06 | House | Amended |
2022-04-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-31 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 11 | 440 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 11 | 445 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 4 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |