SC H4015 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Repealing Chapter 11 Of Title 13 Relating To The New Horizons Development Authority.
Title
New Horizons Development Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-04-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-0 |
2019-04-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-3-19 |
2019-04-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |