SC H4003 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Roll call Ayes-25 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Roll call Ayes-25 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At The Intersections Of South Carolina Highway 28 And The Abbeville/anderson County Line, South Carolina Highway 28 And The Abbeville/mccormick County Line, And South Carolina Highway 72 And The Abbeville/greenwood County Line That Contain The Words "abbeville High School Panthers 2010 Class A State Football Champions And 2011 Class A State Softball Champions".
Title
Signs reflecting Abbeville High School Panthers State Football and Softball Championships
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Agnew [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 2 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Adopt Amendment Number 2 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | Roll call Ayes-25 Nays-0 | |
2012-02-23 | Returned to House with concurrence | |
2012-02-23 | Concurred in amendment | |
2012-02-22 | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 | |
2012-02-22 | Returned to Senate with amendments | |
2012-02-22 | Senate amendment amended | |
2012-02-09 | Debate adjourned until Tues., 02-21-12 | |
2012-02-07 | Returned to House with amendments | |
2012-02-07 | Adopted | |
2012-02-07 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-02-02 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-04-14 | Introduced | |
2011-04-14 | Adopted, sent to Senate | |
2011-04-13 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-03-31 | Introduced |