SC H3994 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-15 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-15 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enact The "south Carolina Read To Succeed Act" By Adding Chapter 155 To Title 59, To Establish Within The Department Of Education The South Carolina Read To Succeed Office To Implement A Comprehensive, Systemic Approach To Reading With Specific Objectives, To Provide Obligations And Requirements Of The Program, And To Provide Necessary Definitions, Among Other Things.
Title
Read To Succeed Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-04-11 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2014-04-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-1 |
2014-04-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-04-10 | House | Amended |
2014-04-02 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2014-03-27 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-2-14 |
2014-03-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2013-04-18 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0516 (Similar To) 2014-06-26 - Act No. 284
H3926 (Similar To) 2013-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
H3926 (Similar To) 2013-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works