SC H3947 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Fix Noon On Wednesday, May 15, 2013, As The Time To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court For The Sixth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, To Fill The Unexpired Term That Expires June 30, 2016; And As The Date To Meet In Joint Session For The Purpose Of Electing A Member Of The Board Of Trustees Of Coastal Carolina University, Fifth Congressional District Seat, Whose Term Expires On June 30, 2017, And For The Purpose Of Electing A Member Of The Board Of Trustees For The Medical University Of South Carolina, Fifth Congressional District, Medical Seat, Whose Term Expires On June 30, 2016.
Title
Election of judges and universities board of trustees
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Clemmons [R] | Rep. David Mack [D] | Rep. Bruce Bannister [R] | Rep. William Whitmire [R] |
Rep. Phyllis Henderson [R] | Rep. Peter McCoy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar without reference |
2013-04-16 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |
Same As/Similar To
S0614 (Similar To) 2013-04-16 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary