SC H3925 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act No. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Certain Provisions Of Section 59-63-100, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Limitations On Homeschool Student Eligibility To Participate In Public School Interscholastic Activities, Are Wavied For The 2020-2021 And 2021-2022 School Years; And To Provide The Four Academic Course Requirement Of Section 59-39-160, And As Also May Be Provided By Regulation, For Students To Participate In Interscholastic Activities, Including Sports-related Activities, Is Waived For The 2020-2021 School Year Due To The Covid-19 Pandemic, And To Provide Students Must Achieve An Overall Passing Average In At Least Three Academic Courses And Be On Track For Graduation To Participate In Interscholastic Activities, Including All Sports-related Activities, For The 2020-2021 School Year. - Ratified Title
Title
Homeschool student interscholastic participation waiver
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Act No. 101 | |
2021-04-21 | Effective date 04/16/21 | |
2021-04-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-04-15 | Ratified R 28 | |
2021-04-08 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2021-03-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Special order, set for March 23, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Education |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-03-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-1 |
2021-03-10 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-10 | House | Amended |
2021-03-09 | House | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced and read first time |