SC H3915 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-15 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-15 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation, Relating To Fees, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4554, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing and Regulation fees (D. No. 4554)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-15 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2015-04-14 | House | Read second time |
2015-03-25 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S0790 (Similar To) 2015-05-28 - Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry