SC H3887 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognize And Acknowledge The Public Health Hazard Of Pornography Which Leads To A Broad Spectrum Of Individual And Societal Harms, To Express The Need To Address The Pornography Epidemic By Encouraging Education, Prevention, Research, And Policy Changes To Address The Proliferation Of Pornography On The Internet In Particular, And To Call For Regulation Of Pornography On The Internet To Ensure Compliance With Obscenity Laws Of The State.
Title
Pornography
Sponsors
Rep. James Burns [R] | Rep. William Chumley [R] | Rep. Anne Thayer [R] | Rep. John Mccravy [R] |
Rep. Steve Moss [R] | Sen. Dwight Loftis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis |
2018-03-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss |
2018-03-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCravy |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3887&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3887_20170302.htm |