SC H3885 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Require Health Care Practitioners To Wear Identification Badges Displaying Certain Information.
Title
Health care practitioners
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Bannister [R] | Rep. Eric Bedingfield [R] | Rep. Garry Smith [R] | Sen. Dwight Loftis [R] |
Rep. Daniel Hamilton [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2017-03-28 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-28 | House | Amended |
2017-03-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |