SC H3878 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 78-46)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-05 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-05 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Memorialize The Full Committee Of The International Olympic Committee To Oppose The Decision Of Its Executive Board And Reinstate Wrestling As A Core Sport Of The Summer Olympic Games.
Title
International Olympic Committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable General |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Polled out of committee General |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-04-09 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |