SC H3872 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Recalled from Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Recalled from Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 59-150-145 So As To Exempt Certain Personally Identifiable Information Concerning Lottery Claims From Nonconsensual Disclosure Or Release Under The Freedom Of Information Act, To Provide The Lottery Commission May Disclose Certain Information Concerning Lottery Claims Without Consent, And To Provide An Exception For Participants In Certain Promotions; And By Amending Section 30-4-40, Relating To Matters Exempt From Disclosure Under The Freedom Of Information Act, So As To Make A Conforming Change.
Title
Lottery prize claim disclosures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Education |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-05-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2023-05-04 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2023-05-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0 |
2023-05-04 | House | Read second time |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0650 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education