SC H3871 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of Dargan Street In The City Of Florence From Its Intersection With Lucas Street To Its Intersection With Baroody Street "reverend William Levi Thompson Way" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway That Contain This Designation.
Title
Reverend William Levi Thompson Way
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-25 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2015-03-19 | House | Introduced |