SC H3835 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Act No. 254
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Act No. 254
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING ARTICLE 5 TO CHAPTER 9, TITLE 23 TO ENACT THE "SOUTH CAROLINA HYDROGEN PERMITTING ACT" SO AS TO CREATE THE STATE HYDROGEN PERMITTING PROGRAM AND TO STATE THE PURPOSE OF THE PROGRAM; TO PROVIDE CERTAIN DEFINITIONS; TO PROVIDE THAT ONLY THE STATE FIRE MARSHAL MAY PERMIT A HYDROGEN FACILITY IN THIS STATE, BUT MAY DELEGATE THIS AUTHORITY TO A COUNTY OR MUNICIPAL OFFICIAL IN SPECIFIC CIRCUMSTANCES; TO PROVIDE THE DUTIES AND OBLIGATIONS OF THE STATE FIRE MARSHAL UNDER THE ACT; TO PROVIDE REQUIREMENTS FOR A PARTY SEEKING TO RENOVATE OR CONSTRUCT A HYDROGEN FACILITY; TO PROVIDE THE STATE FIRE MARSHAL MAY IMPOSE CERTAIN FEES RELATED TO PERMITTING, LICENSING, AND INSPECTING UNDER THE ACT; TO PROVIDE PENALTIES FOR A PERSON WHO CONVEYS OR ATTEMPTS TO CONVEY HYDROGEN IN VIOLATION OF THE ACT; AND TO AMEND SECTION 23-9-20, RELATING TO DUTIES OF THE STATE FIRE MARSHAL, SO AS TO PROVIDE THE STATE FIRE MARSHAL SHALL SUPERVISE ENFORCEMENT OF THE SOUTH CAROLINA HYDROGEN PERMITTING PROGRAM. - ratified title
Title
Provide The State Fire Marshal Shall Supervise Enforcement Of The South Carolina Hydrogen Permitting Program. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Act No. 254 | |
2010-07-01 | Effective date 06/14/10 | |
2010-06-14 | Became law without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-07 | Ratified R 318 | |
2010-06-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-06-03 | Read third time and enrolled SJ-11 | |
2010-06-02 | Read second time SJ-36 | |
2010-05-19 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary SJ-30 | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Campbell | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-28 | |
2009-04-14 | Introduced and read first time SJ-28 | |
2009-04-03 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-04-02 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day HJ-44 | |
2009-04-02 | Read second time HJ-42 | |
2009-04-01 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference HJ-7 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3835&session=118 |