SC H3821 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Require Certain Institutions Of Higher Education To Offer Mandatory Courses On The Prescribing And Monitoring Of Schedule Ii, Iii, And Iv Controlled Substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2017-04-11SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-04-07HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2017-04-06HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2017-04-06HouseRoll call Yeas-98 Nays-0
2017-04-06HouseRead second time
2017-04-06HouseAmended
2017-03-30HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
2017-03-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Knight
2017-03-08HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam, Cogswell
2017-03-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jordan, B.Newton, Martin, Erickson, Jefferson, Cobb-Hunter, Govan, Long
2017-02-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Allison, Arrington, Forrester, Tallon, Hamilton, Felder, Elliott
2017-02-22HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0302 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Act No. 185
H3071 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
59103155(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback