SC H3071 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Include Marching Band Instruction Based On The South Carolina Academic Standards For The Visual And Performing Arts And Participation On Interscholastic Athletics Teams.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physical education alternatives

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-12HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2016-12-15HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2016-12-15HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0302 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
592980(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback