SC H3793 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Act No. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Act No. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize Certain Degree Programs So Long As State General Funds Are Not Appropriated For The Operations Of The Degree Program
Title
Higher Ed mission and goals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Act No. 14 | |
2017-04-27 | Effective date 4/24/17 | |
2017-04-24 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-04-19 | Ratified R 23 | |
2017-04-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2017-04-05 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2017-03-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2017-03-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-03-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-08 | House | Amended |
2017-03-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Whipper |
2017-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ryhal, Hewitt, Davis |
2017-03-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2017-02-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Knight |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0350 (Similar To) 2017-02-02 - Referred to Committee on Education