SC H3792 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Require Minimum Numbers Of Toilets And Lavatories At Middle School Stadiums And High School Stadiums Based On Gender And Seating Capacity, And To Provide These Standards Apply Notwithstanding Otherwise Applicable Building Codes And Plumbing Codes
Title
Football stadiums
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Act No. 25 | |
2017-05-12 | Effective date 5/9/17 | |
2017-05-09 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-04 | Ratified R 44 | |
2017-04-20 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-1 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2017-03-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-03-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2017-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-08 | House | Amended |
2017-03-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |