SC H3778 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-6-3375, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Tax Credit For A Port Cargo Volume Increase, So As To Increase The Maximum Amount Of The Available Tax Credits For Port Cargo Volume Increases, And To Provide For A Port Transportation Credit For The Costs Of Transporting Freight, Goods, And Materials From Qualifying Facilities Located In Certain Counties In South Carolina To A South Carolina Port Facility; And By Adding Section 12-36-2140 So As To Provide That A Port Facility Is A Distribution Facility For Purposes Of Certain Sales Tax Exemptions.
Title
Tax credit, port cargo volume increase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-04-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2019-04-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-04 | House | Amended |
2019-04-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2019-03-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Stavrinakis |
2019-02-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott, B.Cox, Morgan |
2019-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter, W.Cox, Bannister |
2019-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clary, Stringer |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0439 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Act No. 37