SC H3735 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-23 - Act No. 226
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-23 - Act No. 226
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, TO ENACT THE "ANN S. PERDUE INDEPENDENT AUTOPSY FAIRNESS ACT OF 2010", BY ADDING SECTION 44-43-730 SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT IF A PERSON DIES IN A HOSPITAL OR HEALTH CARE FACILITY WHERE INVASIVE PROCEDURES ARE PERFORMED, THE PERSON AUTHORIZED TO CONSENT HAS THE RIGHT TO HAVE AN AUTOPSY PERFORMED; THE HOSPITAL OR HEALTH CARE FACILITY SHALL INFORM IN WRITING THE PERSON AUTHORIZED TO CONSENT OF THE RIGHT TO HAVE AN AUTOPSY PERFORMED AND THAT IT MUST BE PAID FOR BY A PRIVATE SOURCE; AND TO AMEND SECTION 17-5-530, RELATING TO CIRCUMSTANCES REQUIRING THE CORONER OR MEDICAL EXAMINER TO BE NOTIFIED OF CERTAIN DEATHS, SO AS TO REQUIRE SUCH NOTIFICATION WHEN A PERSON DIES IN A HEALTH CARE FACILITY, OTHER THAN A NURSING HOME, WITHIN TWENTY FOUR HOURS OF ENTERING THE HEALTH CARE FACILITY OR WITHIN TWENTY-FOUR HOURS OF HAVING AN INVASIVE SURGICAL PROCEDURE PERFORMED AT THE HEALTH CARE FACILITY, AND TO PROVIDE THAT THE AUTOPSY MUST NOT BE PERFORMED AT THE HEALTH CARE FACILITY OR BY A PHYSICIAN AT THE HEALTH CARE FACILITY. - ratified title
Title
Require Such Notification When A Person Dies In A Health Care Facility, Other Than A Nursing Home, Within Twenty Four Hours Of Entering The Health Care Facility Or Within Twenty-four Hours Of Having An Invasive Surgical Procedure Performed At The Health Care Facility, And To Provide That The Autopsy Must Not Be Performed At The Health Care Facility Or By A Physician At The Health Care Facility. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Vick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | Act No. 226 | |
2010-06-16 | Effective date 07/01/10 | |
2010-06-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-06-01 | Ratified R 271 | |
2010-05-25 | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-6 HJ-111 | |
2010-05-25 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled HJ-111 | |
2010-05-19 | Debate adjourned on amendments HJ-6 | |
2010-05-18 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments SJ-14 | |
2010-05-18 | Amended SJ-14 | |
2010-05-12 | Read second time SJ-19 | |
2010-04-22 | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs SJ-19 | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs SJ-12 | |
2010-02-23 | Introduced and read first time SJ-12 | |
2010-02-18 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-20 | |
2010-02-17 | Read second time HJ-219 | |
2010-02-17 | Amended HJ-217 | |
2010-02-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-02-04 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs HJ-8 | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs HJ-17 | |
2009-03-24 | Introduced and read first time HJ-17 |
Same As/Similar To
S0572 (Similar To) 2009-03-19 - Scrivener's error corrected
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3735&session=118 |