SC H3720 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Act No. 164
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Act No. 164
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND SECTION 15-9-720, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO SERVICE ON UNKNOWN PARTIES BY PUBLICATION IN CERTAIN ACTIONS CONCERNING REAL PROPERTY, SO AS TO PROVIDE FOR SERVICE OF ALL COURT-REQUIRED DOCUMENTS BY PUBLICATION AND, FURTHER, IN AN ACTION INVOLVING MULTIPLE UNITS IN A SINGLE HORIZONTAL PROPERTY REGIME, FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION BY CONSOLIDATING THE SERVICES INTO A SINGLE SERVICE THAT IDENTIFIES EACH APARTMENT INCLUDED IN THE ACTION BASED ON THE APARTMENT'S DESCRIPTION IN THE MASTER DEED. - ratified title
Title
Provide For Service Of All Court-required Documents By Publication And, Further, In An Action Involving Multiple Units In A Single Horizontal Property Regime, For Service By Publication By Consolidating The Services Into A Single Service That Identifies Each Apartment Included In The Action Based On The Apartment's Description In The Master Deed. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Act No. 164 | |
2010-05-21 | Effective date 05/12/10 | |
2010-05-12 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Ratified R 194 | |
2010-04-21 | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 HJ-22 | |
2010-04-21 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled HJ-22 | |
2010-04-20 | Debate adjourned until Wednesday, April 21, 2010 HJ-82 | |
2010-03-24 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments SJ-24 | |
2010-03-18 | Read second time SJ-35 | |
2010-03-18 | Committee Amendment Adopted SJ-35 | |
2010-03-17 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary SJ-13 | |
2009-05-05 | Referred to Subcommittee: L.Martin (ch), Rankin, Hutto, Bright, Davis | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-16 | |
2009-04-30 | Introduced and read first time SJ-16 | |
2009-04-30 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-14 | |
2009-04-29 | Read second time | |
2009-04-29 | Amended | |
2009-04-28 | Debate adjourned until Wednesday, April 29, 2009 HJ-29 | |
2009-04-22 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary HJ-8 | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-10 | |
2009-03-24 | Introduced and read first time HJ-10 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3720&session=118 |