SC H3632 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins, Sandifer
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins, Sandifer
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 16-17-600, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Destruction Of Human Remains Or Repositories And The Desecration Of Burial Grounds, Among Other Things, So As To Provide That It Is Unlawful To Deface, Vandalize, Injure, Or Remove A Historical Monument Or Historical Marker On Public Property, To Provide Penalties, To Provide Procedures For Correction To The Public Property, And To Provide For The Recovery Of Certain Costs Associated With The Corrections.
Title
Human remains, desecration or destruction of
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins, Sandifer |
2020-02-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliam, Oremus, Forrester, Haddon |
2019-05-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones, Elliott |
2019-03-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Herbkersman |
2019-02-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton, Taylor |
2019-02-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Tallon, Pope, Bryant, D.C.Moss, Daning, Hiott, Martin, Sottile, Gagnon, Yow |
2019-02-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Young, White |
2019-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hardee, G.R.Smith |
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Toole |
2019-01-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill, Whitmire |
2019-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCravy, Trantham, Willis, Chumley |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0513 (Similar To) 2019-02-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3632&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3632_20190116.htm |