SC H3622 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 240
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 240
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revise And Add Certain Definitions
Title
Podiatrist and Podiatric Surgery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 72 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Table Motion To Recommit (Y: 71 N: 38 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 72 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: Table Motion To Recommit (Y: 71 N: 38 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 240 | |
2018-05-30 | Effective date 05/17/18 | |
2018-05-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 240 | |
2018-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Amended |
2018-05-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-04-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-04-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-72 Nays-41 |
2018-04-04 | House | Read second time |
2018-04-04 | House | Amended |
2018-03-20 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Atkinson |
2018-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thigpen |
2018-02-28 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2018-02-27 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2018-02-27 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2018-02-22 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2018-02-22 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2018-02-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Magnuson, Long |
2018-02-22 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Kirby |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-05-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Robinson-Simpson |
2017-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 51 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 51 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 51 | 67 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |