SC H3620 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Remove The Ten Thousand Dollar Earnings Limitation On Employees Returning To Employment Who Retired Before January 2, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement benefits after returning to covered employment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-04-03SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-03HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-02HouseRoll call Yeas-110 Nays-0
2019-04-02HouseRead second time
2019-04-02HouseAmended
2019-04-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers, R.Williams, Jefferson, Weeks
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
2019-03-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor, Cobb-Hunter
2019-01-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H4249 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
911790(n/a)See Bill Text
91190(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback