SC H3615 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-22 - Act No. 70
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-22 - Act No. 70
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND CHAPTER 7 OF TITLE 32, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO PRENEED FUNERAL CONTRACTS, SO AS TO TRANSFER THE POWERS AND DUTIES FOR THE REGULATION OF PRENEED FUNERAL CONTRACTS FROM THE STATE BOARD OF FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS TO THE DEPARTMENT OF CONSUMER AFFAIRS AND TO CONFORM THE PROVISIONS OF THIS CHAPTER TO THIS TRANSFER OF AUTHORITY, TO INCREASE CRIMINAL FINES FOR VIOLATIONS, TO PROVIDE FOR ADMINISTRATIVE PENALTIES, TO PROVIDE FOR A CONTESTED CASE HEARING FROM AN ORDER OF THE DEPARTMENT, AND TO MAKE TECHNICAL CORRECTIONS; AND TO AMEND SECTION 40-19-290, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO LICENSED EMBALMERS AND FUNERAL DIRECTORS PLACING PAYMENTS RECEIVED FOR FUNERAL MERCHANDISE IN A TRUST ACCOUNT, SO AS TO CHANGE "STATE BOARD OF FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS" TO "SOUTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF CONSUMER AFFAIRS" AND TO PROVIDE THAT THESE PAYMENTS MUST BE HELD UNTIL THE MERCHANDISE IS DELIVERED FOR USE OR IN THE POSSESSION OF THE PURCHASER. - ratified title
Title
Change "state Board Of Financial Institutions" To "south Carolina Department Of Consumer Affairs" And To Provide That These Payments Must Be Held Until The Merchandise Is Delivered For Use Or In The Possession Of The Purchaser. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-22 | Act No. 70 | |
2009-06-22 | Effective date 07/01/09 | |
2009-06-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2009-05-27 | Ratified R 108 | |
2009-05-20 | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled SJ-48 | |
2009-05-20 | Returned to Senate with amendments HJ-50 | |
2009-05-20 | Senate amendment amended HJ-50 | |
2009-05-19 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments SJ-20 | |
2009-05-14 | Read second time SJ-33 | |
2009-05-14 | Committee Amendment Adopted SJ-33 | |
2009-05-13 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary SJ-14 | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Cleary, Williams, Mulvaney, Nicholson | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-14 | |
2009-04-01 | Introduced and read first time SJ-14 | |
2009-04-01 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-30 | |
2009-03-31 | Read second time HJ-46 | |
2009-03-26 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks | |
2009-03-25 | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry HJ-4 | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry HJ-8 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced and read first time HJ-7 |
Same As/Similar To
S0496 (Similar To) 2009-03-05 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Cleary, Williams, Mulvaney, Nicholson
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3615&session=118 |