SC H3564 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 57-25-40, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Department Of Transportation's Issuance Of Permits That Allow The Installation And Maintenance Of Benches Upon Which Commercial Advertisements May Be Placed, So As To Provide That The Permits Must Be Renewed Annually Instead Of Terminated On July 1, 2010.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide That The Permits Must Be Renewed Annually Instead Of Terminated On July 1, 2010.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-16HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2020-12-16HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0438 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
572540(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback