SC H3556 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 25-1-440, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Powers And Duties Of The Governor During A Declared Emergency, So As To Provide That A Declared State Of Emergency For A Public Health Emergency Shall Not Continue For A Period Of More Than Thirty Days Without The Passage Of A Joint Resolution By The General Assembly Expressly Approving The Declaration's Continuation, To Provide That Upon The Expiration Of The Governor's Original Emergency Declaration, He May Not Declare A New State Of Emergency Based Upon The Same Or Substantially Similar Facts And Circumstances As The Original Declaration Without The Passage Of A Joint Resolution By The General Assembly Expressly Approving The New Emergency Declaration, To Require The Governor To Submit A Report To The General Assembly Before Continuing A Declared State Of Emergency Or Declaring A New State Of Emergency Based Upon The Same Or Substantially Similar Facts And Circumstances As The Original Declaration, And To Define Relevant Terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State of emergency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-16HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-16HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251440(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback