SC H3548 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Roll call Ayes-24 Nays-21
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Roll call Ayes-24 Nays-21
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibit Dismemberment Abortions, With Exceptions, And To Define Relevant Terms; To Provide For Injunctive Relief And Civil Remedies To Enforce The Provisions Of The Article; To Create Criminal Penalties; And For Other Purposes.
Title
SC Unborn Child Protection from Dismemberment Abortion Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: To Recommit (Y: 24 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Rule 15a-cloture (Y: 25 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Rule 15a-cloture (Y: 24 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Rule 15a-cloture (Y: 24 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Rule 15a-cloture (Y: 23 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: To Adjourn (Y: 10 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: To Adjourn (Y: 12 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Rule 15a-cloture (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: To Set For Special Order (Y: 26 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 13 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 36 N: 66 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 21 N: 71 NV: 24 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 26 N: 74 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Rule 15a-cloture (Y: 25 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Rule 15a-cloture (Y: 24 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Rule 15a-cloture (Y: 24 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Rule 15a-cloture (Y: 23 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: To Adjourn (Y: 10 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: To Adjourn (Y: 12 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Rule 15a-cloture (Y: 25 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: To Set For Special Order (Y: 26 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 13 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 36 N: 66 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 21 N: 71 NV: 24 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 26 N: 74 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-24 Nays-21 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-31 Nays-11 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Amended |
2018-05-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-28 Nays-10 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Amended |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Special order, set for April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-26 Nays-18 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Motion For Special Order Failed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-30 | House | Roll call Yeas-83 Nays-17 |
2017-03-30 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-89 Nays-17 |
2017-03-29 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-29 | House | Amended |
2017-03-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Atwater, Ballentine, Willis, Simrill, Lowe |
2017-03-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins, Hamilton, Bedingfield |
2017-03-27 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2017-03-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope, Toole |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith |
2017-01-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss |
2017-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott, Henderson |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |