SC H3498 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Amendment To Repeal Section 4, Article Xi Of The Constitution Of South Carolina, 1895, Relating To The Prohibition Against The State Or Its Political Subdivisions Providing Direct Aid To Religious Or Other Private Educational Institutions.
Title
Constitutional amendment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis |
2022-03-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon, Simrill |
2021-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer |
2021-01-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-12-16 | House | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3498&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3498_20201216.htm |