SC H3441 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Act No. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide Workers' Compensation Payments By Employers' Representatives Must Be Made By Checks Or Electronic Payment Systems

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 27) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15 Act No. 24
2017-05-12 Effective date 5/9/17
2017-05-09 Signed By Governor
2017-05-04 Ratified R 43
2017-05-03SenateRead third time and enrolled
2017-05-02SenateRoll call Ayes-36 Nays-0
2017-05-02SenateRead second time
2017-04-27 Scrivener's error corrected
2017-04-26SenateCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2017-03-30SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Young (ch), Sabb, Talley
2017-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-01-27HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2017-01-26HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2017-01-26HouseRoll call Yeas-90 Nays-0
2017-01-26HouseRead second time
2017-01-26HouseAmended
2017-01-26 Scrivener's error corrected
2017-01-25HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2017-01-17HouseRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
429450(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback