SC H3399 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-26 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-26 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Intersection Of United States Highway 15 And Browntown Road In Lee County "w. A. Berry Memorial Intersection" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Intersection Containing These Words.
Title
WA Berry Memorial Intersection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-01-26 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2023-01-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-12-08 | House | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3399&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3399_20221208.htm |