SC H3395 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose, Rivers
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provide A Base State Minimum Wage And A Schedule To Gradually Implement An Adjusted Minimum Wage To Twelve Dollars Per Hour Over A Three-year Period, To Provide A Method For Calculating Future Mandatory Adjustments, To Provide For The Notification Of These Adjustments To Employers And Employees By The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation, To Provide That It Is Unlawful For An Employer To Fail To Pay The State Minimum Wage Or To Retaliate Against An Employee For Certain Actions Regarding Enforcement Of The State Minimum Wage Law, To Provide Remedies For Violations, To Provide A Five-year Statute Of Limitations, And To Provide That Actions Brought Pursuant To This Act May Be Brought As A Class Action Under State Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum wage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose, Rivers
2019-04-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard
2019-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
2019-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis, Clemmons
2019-01-15HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411125(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback