SC H3388 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 12-6-525 So As To Allow Married Taxpayers That File A Joint Federal Return To Calculate Their Amount Of South Carolina Income Tax Owed For The Tax Year As Though Each Taxpayer Filed A Return As A Single Taxpayer If The Taxpayers' Cumulative Tax Owed Would Be Less Than The Amount They Would Owe Had They Filed A Joint Return.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon
2021-01-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McGarry
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham, Oremus, Huggins
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0400 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
126525(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback