SC H3388 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 53-3-95 So As To Provide That The Month Of April Of Each Year Is Declared "move Over Awareness Month" In South Carolina And Require The Department Of Transportation And The Department Of Public Safety To Conduct Programs During This Month That Emphasize The Importance Of Motor Vehicle Drivers Moving Over Into An Adjacent Lane Whenever Possible When Approaching Or Passing Through A Highway Work Zone, An Emergency Scene, Or Any Other Highway Traffic Incident; By Adding Section 56-5-1539 So As To Provide That Certain State Governmental Entities Must Allow A Driver Of A Wrecker Or Towing Service Vehicle To Take Traffic Incident Management Training Free Of Charge; And To Amend Section 56-5-1538, Regarding Emergency Scene Management, So As To Provide That The Department Of Motor Vehicles Shall Print Information In Its Driver's Manuals Relating To The State's "move Over Law".
Title
Move Over Awareness Month declared as April of each year
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Amended |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2019-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon |
2019-01-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 3 | 95 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 1538 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 1539 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |